Case: 01-90-00432-CV
01-90-00432-CV
05/22/1990
Original proceeding for writ of mandamus (Gov't 22.221(a), (b))
Eddington, Warren L.
Judge Hugo Touchy
Yes
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1990 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
08/02/1990 | Date final opinion release for publication | | |
07/26/1990 | Opinion issued | Grant motion | |
07/26/1990 | Opinion issued | Grant motion | |
06/26/1990 | Submitted | | |
06/26/1990 | Submission | | |
06/26/1990 | Submitted | | |
06/08/1990 | Order entered | Grant motion | |
05/22/1990 | Motion for leave to file writ of mandamus | | |
05/22/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/10/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Respondent | Kevin H. George |
State | Relator | Hon. Richard L. Eddington |
State | Relator | Jeffrey J. Asperger |
State | Respondent | Cynthia Satel Allison |
Trial Court Information
129th District Court
Harris