Case: C-9864
C-9864
05/22/1990
Combined relief sought/filed
DAVID OSTERMAN
THE HONORABLE JAMES R. FRY JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/05/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/04/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/29/1990 | Motion for Rehearing | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | | |
10/29/1990 | Motion for Rehearing | Relator | | |
08/27/1990 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | behalf of TX Medical Association, Atty-Donald P. Wilcox & C. J. Francisco, III 1801 N. Lamar Blvd. | |
06/15/1990 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | Respondent | ON BEHALF OF DAVID MARTIN | |
06/01/1990 | Supplemental Brief filed | Relator | TO PET FOR WRIT OF MAND, REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION & REQ FOR TEMP RELIEF/PET FOR WRIT OF HC & SUPP BR. | |
05/22/1990 | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed | Relator | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/05/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/04/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/12/1991 | Case Stored | Rehearing Overruled | | |
12/19/1990 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
12/19/1990 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | OF M/L/F AND HABEAS CORPUS | |
10/29/1990 | Motion for Rehearing | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | | |
10/29/1990 | Motion for Rehearing | | | |
10/29/1990 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | Record remains in Clerk's office | | |
10/10/1990 | M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Overruled | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
10/10/1990 | M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Overruled | as supplemented; stay order iss.5/22/90 vacated; pet. f/writ of HC denied. | |
10/10/1990 | Petition for writ of habeas corpus disposed. | Denied | | |
10/10/1990 | Stay order vacated. See remarks & op/disp screen | Stay O. issued 5/22/90 vacated & set aside. | | |
08/27/1990 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | behalf of TX Medical Association, Atty-Donald P. Wilcox & C. J. Francisco, III 1801 N. Lamar Blvd. | | |
06/15/1990 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | ON BEHALF OF DAVID MARTIN | | |
06/04/1990 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | DAVID MARTIN'S REPLY DUE 06-11-90 | |
06/01/1990 | Supplemental Brief filed | TO PET FOR WRIT OF MAND, REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION & REQ FOR TEMP RELIEF/PET FOR WRIT OF HC & SUPP BR. | | |
05/22/1990 | Motion for temporary relief | | | |
05/22/1990 | Motion for temporary relief disposed | Filing granted | | |
05/22/1990 | Motion to Expedite Filed | | | |
05/22/1990 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | | |
05/22/1990 | Exhibits received | | | |
05/22/1990 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | | | |
05/22/1990 | No description available. | | | |
05/22/1990 | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed | | | |
05/22/1990 | Petition for writ received | | | |
05/22/1990 | Request made for reply to proceeding | IN TEN DAYS FR/RESP - BY 6/1/90. | | |
05/22/1990 | Stay Order issued | STAYING ORDER OF 5/4/90 ISSUED OUT OF 15TH D.C., GRAYSON CO., CAUSE NO. 111,630 RE CONTEMPT/SANCTIONS. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/12/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INS ASSOC. | Respondent | Mr. James Corley Henderson |
DAVID RAY MARTIN | Respondent | Ms. Cynthia L. Stagner |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-90-00000-CV
Denied
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
15th District Court
Grayson
Honorable James R. Fry
87-11-111,630