Case: PD-2069-00
PD-2069-00
12/06/2000
PDR Case Type
CHARLESTON, JOHN WAYNE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/2001 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
03/21/2001 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
03/21/2001 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
02/06/2001 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
12/06/2000 | PDR FILED | | |
12/06/2000 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/12/2001 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Charleston, John Wayne | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Ralph K. Burgess |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Neal E. Birmingham |
Court of Appeals Information:
06-99-00141-CR
AFF 11-2-00
6th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
5th District Court
Cass
Honorable JACK CARTER
99-F-006