Case: 14-94-01017-CV
14-94-01017-CV
10/18/1994
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Freeman, Sidney L.
Montgomery John, Judge of 309th District Court, Harris County
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/28/2011 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
10/31/1994 | Case stored | | |
10/21/1994 | Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RES | DENIED | |
10/21/1994 | Opinion issued | DENIED | |
10/21/1994 | Opinion issued | DENIED | |
10/20/1994 | Submitted | | |
10/20/1994 | Submission | | |
10/20/1994 | Submitted | | |
10/18/1994 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
10/18/1994 | Exhibits received | | |
10/18/1994 | Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES | | |
10/18/1994 | Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL | | |
10/18/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/21/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MONTGOMERY, JOHN | Respondent | Judge, 309th District Court |
FREEMAN, SIDNEY L. | Relator | Bruce A. Baughman |
MONTGOMERY, JOHN | Respondent | M. Gay Fowler |
Trial Court Information
309th District Court
Harris
Honorable JOHN D. MONTGOMERY
92-26250