Case: PD-2069-99
PD-2069-99
12/08/1999
PDR Case Type
LANE, ERIC BRANDON
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/24/2000 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
02/09/2000 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
02/09/2000 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
01/13/2000 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
12/08/1999 | PDR FILED | | |
12/08/1999 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/03/2000 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
LANE, ERIC BRANDON | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Bill Burdock |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Tim Curry |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-98-00286-CR
AFF 10-7-99
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 2
Tarrant
Honorable R. E. THORNTON
0690536AR