Case: 02-89-00293-CV
02-89-00293-CV
12/01/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Smith,Faye Gwendolyn,Indiv.& as Execut.of the Est. Coy Smith
Williams, Eldon, Barbara Williams, Roy E. Hayes,ex ux, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/05/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/21/1990 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
06/14/1990 | Letter Brief Filed | | |
06/12/1990 | Submitted | | |
06/12/1990 | Submission | | |
05/18/1990 | Motion for Continuance Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/01/1990 | Motion for Continuance Filed | | |
04/13/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
04/02/1990 | No Description Available. | | |
04/02/1990 | Order Entered | | |
03/19/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
03/09/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/09/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
02/13/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/12/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
02/09/1990 | Response Filed | | |
01/09/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/09/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
12/13/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
12/13/1989 | Submission | | |
12/08/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
12/08/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
12/01/1989 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/01/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/05/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Honts, Bryan | Appellee | Bryan Honts |
Smith, Faye Gwendolyn Indiv. | Appellant | |
Smith, Coy Execut Of Est. Of | Appellant | |
Hayes, Fredda M. | Appellee | |
Williams, Eldon | Appellee | Larry Bracken |
Williams, Barbara | Appellee | Larry Bracken |
Hayes, Eldon Roy E. | Appellee |
Trial Court Information
48th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Clyde R. Ashworth
48-117082-88