Case: 02-90-00033-CV
02-90-00033-CV
02/14/1990
Miscellaneous civil
Design Information Systems
Feith Systems & Software, Inc.,a Corp. and Don Feith, Indiv.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/21/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/11/1991 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
06/05/1991 | Writ Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/01/1991 | Motion Filed | | |
02/07/1991 | Writ Filed | | |
01/09/1991 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
12/19/1990 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
12/05/1990 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
09/05/1990 | Order Entered | | |
09/05/1990 | Submitted | | |
09/05/1990 | Submission | | |
05/03/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
04/09/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
03/08/1990 | No Description Available. | | |
03/02/1990 | No Description Available. | | |
03/02/1990 | Submission | | |
02/14/1990 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/14/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/23/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Feith, Don Individually | Appellee | |
Design Information Systems | Appellant | |
Feith Systems & Software, Inc. | Appellee |
Trial Court Information
342nd District Court
Tarrant
-108688-87