Case: 06-02-00019-CV
06-02-00019-CV
02/15/2002
Contract
CMS Partners, Ltd.
Plumrose USA, Incorporated
No
5th Court of Appeals
02/15/2002
05-02-00012-CV
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/19/2010 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
05/29/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |||
03/20/2003 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
01/16/2003 | Submitted | | |||
12/03/2002 | Submission | | |||
08/01/2002 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||
07/09/2002 | Mot. to ext. time to file reply brief - granted | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/05/2002 | Mot. ext. time to file Reply Brief | | |||
07/05/2002 | Appearance of counsel | | |||
07/05/2002 | SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S RECORD FILED | | |||
06/12/2002 | Brief Filed | | |||
06/12/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/10/2002 | Brief Filed | | |||
04/08/2002 | Clerks Record Filed | | |||
02/20/2002 | Acknowledging receipt of transferred cases | | |||
02/15/2002 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||
02/12/2002 | Reporters Record Filed | | |||
01/04/2002 | Notice of appeal received | | |||
01/04/2002 | Docketing Statement Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/29/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/19/2010 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Plumrose USA, Inc. | Appellee | Hon. David J. Anderson Monica W. Latin |
CMS Partners, Inc. | Appellant | Hon. Mark C. Snyder John R. Mercy |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Robert C. Jenevein
CC-01-4464-C