Case: 02-99-00542-CR
02-99-00542-CR
12/08/1999
Indecency with a Child
John David Kennedy
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/08/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/30/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction | |
03/29/2000 | Submitted | | |
02/08/2000 | Letter | | |
02/02/2000 | Letter Brief Filed | | |
01/18/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
12/08/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
12/08/1999 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/08/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles M. Mallin |
Kennedy, John David | Criminal - Appellant | Earl R. Waddell, III |
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Robert K. Gill
0586377D
15yrs - IDTDCJ