Case Information: 83-CM-0308 | |||
Short Caption: | PAYNE, KARL W. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | M10398-82 | Filed Date: | 03/09/1983 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 03/09/1983 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 06/07/1983 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 09/21/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/16/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | PAYNE, KARL W. UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1906 | FARRELLM (TAG) OYEWOLEG (TAG) | |||
03/09/1983 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
06/07/1983 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
09/21/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
11/16/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
12/13/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |