Case: 04-02-00074-CV
04-02-00074-CV
01/24/2002
Summary Judgment
Karl Moore, Individually, As Next Friend of Tanner James Moore, A Minor Child and As Representative of the Estate of Julia Moore, Decedent, (APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE)
Manuel Trevino, Jr. (a/k/a J.T. Trevino), James Anthony Gonzales, Donald Spachek and David Laroy Peters, (APPELLEES/CROSS-APPELLANTS)
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/28/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
05/22/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/13/2003 | Higher Court Decision | Motion or Writ Denied | |
03/27/2003 | Higher Court Decision | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/27/2003 | Information regarding cause received | | |
12/11/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
12/05/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
11/20/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/25/2002 | Submitted | | |
07/22/2002 | Submission | | |
06/24/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/24/2002 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
05/24/2002 | Brief Filed | | |
04/30/2002 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
04/30/2002 | Brief Filed | | |
04/24/2002 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/22/2002 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
04/11/2002 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/04/2002 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
04/01/2002 | Information regarding cause received | | |
03/22/2002 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
03/14/2002 | Case NOT referred to mediation. ADR file closed. | | |
03/13/2002 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
03/07/2002 | Information regarding cause received | | |
02/15/2002 | ADR Addendum filed | | |
02/15/2002 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
02/15/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/15/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/24/2002 | ADR Addendum filed | | |
01/24/2002 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
01/24/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/24/2002 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
01/24/2002 | Information regarding cause received | | |
01/24/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/16/2002 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/28/2012 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Manuel Trevino, et al. | Appellee | Jacqueline M. Stroh Deborah L. Klein |
Karl Moore, Individually, et al. | Appellant | John N. Tyler |
Trial Court Information
285th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable David A. Berchelmann, Jr.
2000-CI-09004