Case: 05-02-00103-CV
05-02-00103-CV
01/22/2002
Contract
Case Corporation
Hi-Class Business Systems of America, Inc. and HBS Systems, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/25/2004 | Appendix filed | Appellee | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/17/2017 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
04/27/2017 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/20/2007 | Corrected Mandate Issued | | |||
06/18/2007 | Mandate Issued | | |||
06/18/2007 | Mandate Issued | | |||
10/27/2006 | petition for review disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
06/29/2006 | Petition for Review Filed | | |||
05/23/2006 | Ext to File Petition for Review Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/18/2006 | Ext to File Petition for Review | | |||
05/08/2006 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
04/24/2006 | Ext to File Petition for Review | | |||
03/21/2006 | Opinion to Publishers | | |||
03/14/2006 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | | ||
02/06/2006 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||
02/06/2006 | Rehearing Due | | |||
01/03/2006 | Mot-Ext to File Rehear Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/28/2005 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
12/28/2005 | Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing | | |||
12/21/2005 | Opinion issued | Aff/Rev & Remanded to Trial Ct | | ||
12/21/2005 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
12/21/2005 | Opinion issued | Aff/Rev & Remanded to Trial Ct | | ||
09/07/2004 | Submitted | | |||
09/07/2004 | Submission | | |||
09/07/2004 | Submitted | | |||
09/01/2004 | Letter Filed | | |||
08/24/2004 | Letter Filed | | |||
08/02/2004 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||
07/30/2004 | Reply Brief Due | | |||
07/12/2004 | Submission | | |||
07/04/2004 | Reply Brief Due | | |||
06/30/2004 | Brief Filed | | |||
06/30/2004 | Motion for Extension of Brief Length Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/30/2004 | Motion for Extension on reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/29/2004 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
06/29/2004 | Motion for Extension of Brief Length | | |||
06/29/2004 | Motion for extension on reply brief filed | | |||
06/29/2004 | Reply Brief Received | | |||
06/29/2004 | Reply Brief Due | | |||
06/14/2004 | Reply Brief Due | | |||
06/08/2004 | Motion for Extension of Brief Length Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
06/08/2004 | Motion for Extension on reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/04/2004 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
06/04/2004 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
06/04/2004 | Motion for Extension of Brief Length | | |||
06/01/2004 | Case ready to be set | | |||
06/01/2004 | Motion for Extension of Brief Length Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/01/2004 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/25/2004 | Appendix filed | | |||
05/25/2004 | Appendix Received | | |||
05/25/2004 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/25/2004 | Brief Received | | |||
05/25/2004 | Motion for Extension of Brief Length | | |||
05/25/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
05/14/2004 | Response to Motion | | |||
05/13/2004 | Motion for Extension of Brief Length Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
05/13/2004 | Response to Motion | | |||
05/10/2004 | Response to Motion | | |||
04/29/2004 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
04/29/2004 | Motion for Extension of Brief Length | | |||
04/12/2004 | Brief Filed | | |||
04/10/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
02/26/2004 | Letter Received | | |||
02/25/2004 | Order Entered | | |||
02/25/2004 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
02/25/2004 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
02/20/2004 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
02/20/2004 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
02/02/2004 | Letter Filed | | |||
01/27/2004 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
01/27/2004 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
01/27/2004 | Case reinstated | | |||
11/21/2003 | Letter Filed | | |||
11/20/2003 | Affidavit Filed | | |||
11/20/2003 | Affidavit Filed | | |||
11/20/2003 | Affidavit Filed | | |||
11/19/2003 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
11/19/2003 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
11/19/2003 | Order Entered | Abated | | ||
11/19/2003 | Order Entered | Abated | | ||
11/18/2003 | Affidavit Filed | | |||
11/17/2003 | Letter Received | | |||
11/10/2003 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Due | | |||
10/31/2003 | Brief Due | | |||
10/24/2003 | Letter Received | | |||
10/20/2003 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | | ||
10/15/2003 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
10/15/2003 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
09/27/2003 | Brief Due | | |||
09/22/2003 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
09/16/2003 | Record Returned | | |||
09/15/2003 | Appearance of counsel | | |||
09/15/2003 | Record Checked Out | | |||
09/12/2003 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
09/11/2003 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/10/2003 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
09/01/2003 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |||
08/28/2003 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
07/23/2003 | Letter Received | | |||
07/16/2003 | Letter Received | | |||
07/14/2003 | Letter Filed | | |||
07/14/2003 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | | ||
07/09/2003 | Reporter's Record Received | | |||
06/05/2003 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | | ||
05/30/2003 | Affidavit Filed | | |||
05/28/2003 | Letter Filed | | |||
05/19/2003 | Letter Filed | | |||
05/19/2003 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |||
05/12/2003 | Letter Filed | | |||
04/28/2003 | Letter Filed | | |||
04/22/2003 | Order Entered | | |||
04/11/2003 | Letter Filed | | |||
03/03/2003 | Letter Filed | | |||
01/14/2003 | Letter Received | | |||
01/10/2003 | 10.00 Fee Due | | |||
01/09/2003 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |||
01/09/2003 | Motion Received | | |||
01/09/2003 | Motion to Compel | | |||
01/08/2003 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |||
12/04/2002 | Motion to Compel Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
11/25/2002 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
11/22/2002 | Extension on Reporter's Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/22/2002 | Motion to Compel | | |||
11/19/2002 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |||
11/15/2002 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |||
09/26/2002 | Extension on Reporter's Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/20/2002 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |||
07/12/2002 | Extension on Reporter's Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/08/2002 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |||
06/30/2002 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |||
06/10/2002 | Extension on Reporter's Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/07/2002 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |||
05/31/2002 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |||
05/22/2002 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
02/25/2002 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
02/22/2002 | ADR Report Filed | | |||
02/20/2002 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |||
02/14/2002 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |||
02/06/2002 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |||
02/06/2002 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||
02/06/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
02/05/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
01/30/2002 | ADR Referral Order Issued | | |||
01/23/2002 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
01/23/2002 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||
01/22/2002 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |||
01/22/2002 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |||
01/22/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
01/22/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
01/22/2002 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/17/2017 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Case Corporation | Appellant | S. Vance Wittie E. Paul Cauley, Jr. W. Neil Rambin |
Jenny Bonnes | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Jenny L. Bonnes |
Kim Tinsley | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Kimberly Tinsley |
Hi-class Business Systems Of A | Appellee | Brent L. Brown Cynthia Hollingsworth Larry R. Boyd Charles J. Crawford Richard Abernathy |
John Roach | Mediator | John R. Roach |
Trial Court Information
401st Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Mark J. Rusch
401-01653-97