Case: PD-0524-94
PD-0524-94
05/17/1994
PDR Case Type
BRICE, LEWIS JAMES
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/02/1994 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
08/17/1994 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
08/17/1994 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
06/20/1994 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
05/17/1994 | PDR FILED | | |
05/17/1994 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/13/1994 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BRICE, LEWIS JAMES | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Kerry P. Fitzgerald |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John C. Vance |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-92-01921-CR
AFF 3-29-94
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
292nd District Court
Dallas
F92-59540-V