Case Information: 35404 | |||
Short Caption: | STEESE (FREDERICK) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 38091 , 43553 , 54344 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C108694 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/30/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/29/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/29/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-13354 | |
02/08/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 35369, 35404, 35449, 35461, 35464, 35527, 35547. | 00-01966 | |
05/30/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 30. Mailed on: 05/26/00. | 00-09017 | |
05/30/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/09/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. The clerk of this district court shall have 20 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court, as a supplemental record on appeal, a certified copy of the transcript of the proceeding in district court on March 7, 1995. If the transcript has not yet been prepared and filed in the district court, the district court shall have 10 days to order the prompt preparation of the transcript. If such an order is required, the clerk of the district court shall have 15 days from the date of entry of the district court's order to transmit a copy of that order to the clerk of the court. The clerk of the district court shall have 10 days from the date the transcript is filed in the district court to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcript as a supplemental record on appeal. | 02-13688 | |
09/03/2002 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on August 29, 2002. | 02-15182 | |
10/15/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Laurie Webb & Associates shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file with this court a certified copy of the transcript of the penalty hearing status check conducted on March 7, 1995, in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. 92-C-108694, or if more time is needed, file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Laurie Webb & Associates shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. | 02-17923 | |
12/03/2002 | Order/Procedural | Order. To date, Laurie Webb & Associates has failed to file the transcript of the penalty hearing status check conducted on March 7, 1995. Laurie Webb & Associates shall have 15 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcript or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Laurie Webb & Associates shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. | 02-20639 | |
12/10/2002 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Laurie Webb & Associates regarding transcripts. | 02-21106 | |
01/21/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. On December 10, 2002, Laurie Webb & Associates filed with this court a letter stating that the transcript of the penalty hearing conducted on March 7, 1995, could not be produced and the original notes had been lost. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order.' fn24[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter. We conclude that Steese is entitled only to the relief described herein. This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] NNP03-RR/WM/MG | 03-01067 | |
02/18/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-01149 | |
02/18/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/26/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 20, 2003. | 03-01149 |