Case: 07-84-00053-CR
07-84-00053-CR
03/02/1984
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Leith, Shad E.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/23/1987 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/28/1987 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
12/17/1985 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
12/12/1985 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
10/29/1985 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/18/1985 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
05/03/1985 | Submitted | | |
05/03/1985 | Submission | | |
04/25/1985 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
03/20/1985 | Submission | | |
11/16/1984 | Brief Filed | | |
11/16/1984 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/17/1984 | Brief Filed | | |
09/11/1984 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
09/10/1984 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
08/20/1984 | Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed | | |
07/25/1984 | Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous) | Motion Mooted | |
07/20/1984 | Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous) | | |
06/25/1984 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | GRANT | |
06/22/1984 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
04/24/1984 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | GRANT | |
04/23/1984 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
03/02/1984 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/02/1984 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/23/1987 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
251st District Court
Randall
Honorable David L. Gleason
4315-C
50 years