Case: B-1637
B-1637
07/07/1969
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN C. ODOM, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF LARRY DEAN KOESTLER, DECEASED, AND WILLIAM L. HARDY, ET AL.
INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/11/1970 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
11/07/1969 | Letter brief | Respondent | | |
07/22/1969 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/07/1969 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/16/1970 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/11/1970 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/27/1970 | Opinion issued | | ||
11/07/1969 | Letter brief | | ||
10/01/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/01/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/01/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/01/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/22/1969 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/07/1969 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/07/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
John C. Odom, Administrator of the Estate of Larry Dean Koestler, deceased, and William L. Hardy, et al. | Petitioner | |
Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information