Case: 05-91-01820-CV
05-91-01820-CV
12/10/1991
Other Employment
Infra-Pak (Dallas) Inc.
James Narmour
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/12/2017 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
11/10/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
08/26/1999 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
03/03/1993 | Mandate Issued | | |||
03/03/1993 | Mandate Issued | | |||
12/16/1992 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | | ||
12/16/1992 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | | ||
11/11/1992 | Submission | | |||
11/11/1992 | Submitted | | |||
11/11/1992 | Submission | | |||
11/11/1992 | Submitted | | |||
10/14/1992 | Letter Filed | | |||
10/07/1992 | MattConv | | |||
10/06/1992 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
08/18/1992 | MattConv | | |||
08/03/1992 | Collection letter on Filing Fee | | |||
06/24/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |||
06/24/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/07/1992 | Letter Filed | | |||
05/06/1992 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
05/06/1992 | Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/06/1992 | Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief Disp | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
04/09/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief | | |||
03/31/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief | | |||
03/31/1992 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |||
03/10/1992 | Brief Filed | | |||
03/10/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |||
02/19/1992 | Brief Filed | | |||
01/21/1992 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
01/21/1992 | Transcript Filed | | |||
01/07/1992 | Mot Ext Time File Record Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/07/1992 | Motion - Ext to File Bond Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/23/1991 | Response to Motion | | |||
12/18/1991 | Response to Motion | | |||
12/16/1991 | Response to Motion | | |||
12/13/1991 | Extend Time to File Record | | |||
12/13/1991 | MattConv | | |||
12/12/1991 | Response to Motion | | |||
12/10/1991 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |||
12/10/1991 | MattConv | | |||
12/10/1991 | Motion - Ext. to File Bond | | |||
12/10/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
10/25/1991 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/12/2017 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
44th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe B Brown
91-11498-D