Case: 13-09-00297-CV
13-09-00297-CV
06/02/2009
Mandamus
IN RE: CAREMARKPCS HEALTH, L.P., F/K/A ADVANCEPCS HEALTH, L.P.
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/02/2009 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/26/2010 | Case stored | | |||||
02/22/2010 | Record checked out | | |||||
12/09/2009 | Fee paid | | |||||
12/07/2009 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||
09/18/2009 | Notice of late filing fee | | |||||
07/09/2009 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
07/09/2009 | Petition for writ of mandamus disposed | Dismissed | | ||||
07/09/2009 | Submitted | | |||||
07/09/2009 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
07/08/2009 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |||||
06/23/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
06/12/2009 | Opposition filed | | |||||
06/12/2009 | Document filed | | |||||
06/09/2009 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
06/04/2009 | Order entered | | |||||
06/04/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
06/03/2009 | Record checked in | | |||||
06/02/2009 | Fee paid | | |||||
06/02/2009 | Record filed | | |||||
06/02/2009 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/09/2009 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, L.P., F/K/A ADVANCEPCS HEALTH, L.P. | Relator | H. Victor Thomas Hon. Jose E. Chapa Jr. Reginald Ross Smith Hon. Reagan W. Simpson |
Los Fresnos ISD and McAllen ISD | Real party in interest | Brian Lauten H. Grady Chandler Hon. Ricardo A. Garcia |
Texas Association of School Boards Risk Management Fund and Texas Association of School Boards | Unknown | Benjamin H. Hathaway Hon. Francisco J. Rodriguez |
City of McAllen | Real party in interest | Brian Lauten Hon. Ricardo A. Garcia H. Grady Chandler |
Trial Court Information
370th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Noe Gonzalez
C-1177-05-G