Case: WR-25,823-01
WR-25,823-01
01/03/1994
1107-HC
CONNER, STACY LYNN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/19/2012 | MISC DOCUMENT RECD | | |
02/15/1995 | ACTION TAKEN | File and set | |
01/03/1995 | SUPP RECD | | |
05/18/1994 | ORDER ISSUED | HC Remanded to trial court for evidentiary hearing | |
01/03/1994 | WRIT RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/15/1995 | FILED | FILE & SET |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CONNER, STACY L. | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) |
Court of Appeals Information:
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
237th District Court
Lubbock
90-411,547 A