Case Heading (S-07-0205) | |||||
Case Number: | S-07-0205 | Case Docketed On: | 09/04/2007 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury | ||
Short Title: | SEAONE, LLC v. JAMES E. BENNETT | ||||
Full Title: | SEAONE, LLC, Appellant (Defendant), v. JAMES E. BENNETT, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Seaone LLC | Billie LM Addleman |
Appellee | James E. Bennett | Michael S. Messenger Thomas Wade Redmon |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
09/04/2007 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
09/04/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received | Final | |
09/04/2007 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
09/04/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
09/04/2007 | Order - Sanction - notice of appeal | Order | Sanction - notice of appeal | Final | |
09/06/2007 | Fees - Sanctions received - NOA | Fees | Sanctions received - NOA | Final | |
09/10/2007 | Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion | Record | Court Reporter's certificate of completion | Final | |
10/22/2007 | Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
12/05/2007 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
12/06/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
12/07/2007 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
12/12/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Billie Addleman for appellant. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
12/12/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Michael Messenger for appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
12/26/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
01/04/2008 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
01/04/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
01/15/2008 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Billie LM Addleman for appellant; Michael S. Messenger for appellee) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
01/15/2008 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
03/20/2008 | Motion - Dismiss - stipulated | Motion | Dismiss - stipulated | Final | |
03/20/2008 | Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Order | Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Final | |
03/20/2008 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
03/20/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
03/20/2008 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
03/25/2008 | Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/24/08 by Greta Evans. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |