Case: 05-19-01419-CR
05-19-01419-CR
11/19/2019
Driving While Intoxicated
The State of Texas
Kevin Henriquez-Cisneros
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/25/2020 | Additional authorities filed | State |
| ||||
08/03/2020 | Additional authorities filed | State |
| ||||
07/15/2020 | Additional authorities filed | State |
| ||||
05/05/2020 | Reply brief filed | State |
| ||||
04/20/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
03/31/2020 | Additional authorities filed | State |
| ||||
02/28/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | State |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/14/2020 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
10/02/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded |
| ||||
10/02/2020 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
09/25/2020 | Additional authorities filed |
| |||||
09/22/2020 | Submitted | | |||||
08/04/2020 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||
08/03/2020 | Additional authorities filed |
| |||||
07/15/2020 | Additional authorities filed |
| |||||
05/08/2020 | Letter filed |
| |||||
05/05/2020 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
04/28/2020 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
04/20/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
04/20/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
03/31/2020 | Additional authorities filed |
| |||||
03/30/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
03/29/2020 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
03/27/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
02/28/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
02/28/2020 | State brief due | | |||||
01/30/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/29/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/06/2020 | Record due | | |||||
12/30/2019 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
12/03/2019 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
11/22/2019 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
11/19/2019 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
11/19/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
11/14/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
11/07/2019 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/02/2045 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
12/14/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Joshua Vanderslice |
Henriquez-Cisneros, Kevin | Appellee | Bruce Anton |
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Audrey Moorehead
M18-31403-C
Pamela Durke-Sweeney