Case: 20-0020
20-0020
01/10/2020
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
ERIC C. RALLS
BRIAN FUNK
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/02/2020 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Eric C. Ralls. |
| ||||
01/09/2020 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Eric C. Ralls. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/03/2020 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
04/03/2020 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
03/03/2020 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
03/02/2020 | Motion for Rehearing | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Eric C. Ralls. |
| |||||
02/14/2020 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
01/14/2020 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
01/13/2020 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Brian Funk. | ||||||
01/10/2020 | Call received | Call received from counsel for petitioner regarding resubmission of returned filing. | | |||||
01/10/2020 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
01/09/2020 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Eric C. Ralls. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/03/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Funk, Brian | Respondent | Ms. Beverly A. Whitley Ms. Gwen Irene Walraven Mr. Scott Larson |
Ralls, Eric C. | Petitioner | Mr. Anthony Reed |
Court of Appeals Information:
12-19-00016-CV
Affirmed
592 SW3d 178, 10-31-19
12th Court of Appeals
Honorable Brian Hoyle
Trial Court Information
7th District Court
Smith
Honorable Kerry L. Russell
17-1625-A