Case: 14-23-00031-CV
14-23-00031-CV
01/18/2023
Contract
RDF Agent, LLC, Related Fund Managment, LLC, and Brian Sedrish
Electric Red Ventures, LLC, Manfred Co. L.C. and Monzer Hourani
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/27/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
03/06/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/01/2023 | Case stored | | |||||||
12/01/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
11/30/2023 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||
11/06/2023 | Petition for review was not filed | | |||||||
11/06/2023 | Petition for review due in Supreme Court | | |||||||
10/06/2023 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||
10/06/2023 | Motion for rehearing enbanc due | | |||||||
10/06/2023 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
09/21/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | CONCURRING |
| ||||||
09/21/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||||||
09/21/2023 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||||
06/14/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
06/08/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||
06/08/2023 | Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument |
| |||||||
06/07/2023 | Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument |
| |||||||
05/04/2023 | Set for submission on oral argument |
| |||||||
03/27/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
03/27/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
03/27/2023 | Appellees brief due | | |||||||
03/06/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
03/06/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
02/28/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
02/14/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
02/14/2023 | Response due | | |||||||
02/14/2023 | Response due | | |||||||
02/13/2023 | Notice of late record |
| |||||||
02/13/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
02/10/2023 | Response due | | |||||||
02/02/2023 | Motion to stay disposed | DENIED |
| ||||||
02/02/2023 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
02/01/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
01/31/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
01/31/2023 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||||
01/30/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||
01/30/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||||
01/30/2023 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||||
01/30/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
01/30/2023 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||
01/30/2023 | Court fee due | | |||||||
01/27/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
01/27/2023 | Record due | | |||||||
01/23/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
01/20/2023 | Motion to stay filed |
| |||||||
01/19/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
01/19/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
01/18/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
01/18/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
01/18/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
01/17/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
01/12/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/01/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
12/01/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Electric Red Ventures, LLC, Manfred Co. L.C. and Monzer Hourani | Appellee | Sharon Sue McCally Hunter Mac Barrow Emily Miller Andrew Bender |
RDF Agent, LLC, Related Fund Managment, LLC, and Brian Sedrish | Appellant | Mary Dunn Brian Pidcock |
Trial Court Information
129th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 129th District Court
2022-20609
Court Reporter, 129th District Court