Case Information: 51124 | |||
Short Caption: | MOON VS. MCDONALD CARANO WILSON LLP | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0602660 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/14/2008 / Chubb, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 04/05/2010 at 2:00 PM | Oral Argument Location: | Regional Justice Center |
Submission Date: | 04/05/2010 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Carl M. Hebert--check no. 3706. | ||
02/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-04488 | |
03/03/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Madelyn Shipman. | 08-05300 | |
03/20/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 08-06870 | |
03/25/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Janet L. Chubb. | 08-07285 | |
03/28/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-07772 | |
03/28/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -docketing statement. | 08-07773 | |
04/02/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 08-08191 | |
04/16/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement conference program. | 08-09484 | |
04/22/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing.This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. | 08-09942 | |
05/08/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 08-11548 | |
07/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 20, 2008. | 08-18795 | |
08/21/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-21578 | |
08/21/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 08-21583 | |
09/18/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-24142 | |
10/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 17, 2008. | 08-26763 | |
11/18/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-29375 | |
12/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 08-32442 | |
12/22/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/01/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Las Vegas on April 5, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. (En Banc) | 10-05344 | |
03/24/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 10-07731 | |
04/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. | ||
12/16/2010 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. Dissent: Cherry, J. 126 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 47. EN BANC | 10-32844 | |
01/10/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-00875 | |
01/10/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/21/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 13, 2011. | 11-00875 | |
01/21/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 50282, 53191, 50033, 52543/52961, 52704, 53969, 55714, 52822, 51234, 52911, 49261, 51124, 51603, 52758, 53414, 53983/54471, 55429, 49207. (Letter entered in 50282 as document no. 11-03205.) |