Case: 13-22-00269-CR
13-22-00269-CR
06/09/2022
Assault
Christina Marie Downum
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/26/2022 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||||
10/25/2022 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
08/11/2022 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
08/11/2022 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||||||
08/11/2022 | Submitted | | |||||||
06/13/2022 | Appellant notified that notice of appeal late/show grounds to continue | | |||||||
06/13/2022 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk |
| |||||||
06/13/2022 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||||
06/09/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
03/15/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/25/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored |
10/25/2047 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Downum, Christina Marie | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Coretta T. Graham |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Samuel B. Smith Jr. |
Trial Court Information
36th District Court
San Patricio
Honorable Starr Boldrick Bauer
S-20-3281CR
Kori Hosek
3 yrs deferred comm. sup. and $1,000 fine