Case: 14-20-00318-CR
14-20-00318-CR
04/23/2020
Mandamus
In re Brent Aaron Marshall
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/23/2020 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/10/2020 | Case stored | | |||||
07/10/2020 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
07/10/2020 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
06/30/2020 | Motion disposed | NO ACTION TAKEN |
| ||||
06/25/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | CONCURRING |
| ||||
06/25/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | DENIED |
| ||||
06/24/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
06/24/2020 | Submitted | | |||||
06/08/2020 | Letter filed |
| |||||
05/18/2020 | Motion filed |
| |||||
04/23/2020 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/10/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
07/10/2045 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Marshall, Brent Aaron | Relator | Brent Aaron Marshall |
Trial Court Information
10th District Court
Galveston
Honorable Judge, 10th District Court
19CR2338