Case: 13-92-00557-CV
13-92-00557-CV
10/05/1992
Divorce
Hubbell, Barbara Jean
Hubbell, Ronnie Lee, Sr.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/01/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/16/1993 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/21/1993 | Amended brief filed. | | |
05/13/1993 | Amended brief filed. | | |
05/13/1993 | Submitted | | |
05/13/1993 | Submission | | |
05/06/1993 | Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT | | |
03/04/1993 | Entry of Judge Selection for Case. | | |
02/18/1993 | Submission | | |
12/16/1992 | Supplemental transcript filed | | |
12/03/1992 | Motion to Supplement Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/25/1992 | Oral argument requested | | |
11/25/1992 | Brief Filed | | |
11/18/1992 | Additional Copies of Misc. Motion | | |
11/18/1992 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
11/16/1992 | Motion to supplement transcript | | |
11/03/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/03/1992 | Oral argument requested | | |
11/03/1992 | Brief Filed | | |
10/07/1992 | Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks | | |
10/07/1992 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
10/07/1992 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
10/05/1992 | Transcript Filed | | |
10/05/1992 | Transcript Received | | |
10/05/1992 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/01/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hubbell, Sr., Ronnie Lee | Appellee | Hon. Allen S. Lawrence |
Hubbell, Barbara Jean | Appellant | Michael P. OReilly |
Trial Court Information
36th District Court
Aransas
Honorable Ronald Yeager
10,398-A