Case: 14-16-00009-CV
14-16-00009-CV
01/06/2016
Miscellaneous/other civil
Felipe Gonzalez, Odis F. Newsom, Marcos Hoffman, Peter Ralston, William R. Smith, William M. Wilkins, James L. Babin, Bish Sharma, Camilo Diaz, John N. Stanfield, John R. Dryer, David E. Blockus, Thomas A. Sneed, Robert S. Behringer, Et Al
Universal Pegasus International, Inc., Charles R. Gwirtsman, Charles . Hamilton, Timothy J. Coughlon, Jerry W. Mayfield , Robert A. Deason, Richard Spears, Peter Robertson and Ted Nark
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/24/2017 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
10/07/2016 | Reply brief filed | Appellee |
| ||||
06/01/2016 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
05/12/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
04/12/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/02/2017 | Case stored | | |||||||||||
11/02/2017 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||||||
11/02/2017 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||||||
10/09/2017 | Petition for review was not filed | | |||||||||||
10/09/2017 | Petition for review due in Supreme Court | | |||||||||||
09/08/2017 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||||||
09/08/2017 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||||||
08/24/2017 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||||||||||
01/25/2017 | Submitted | | |||||||||||
01/24/2017 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||||||||
11/29/2016 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||||||||
10/07/2016 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||||||||
06/01/2016 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||||||||
05/12/2016 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||||||
05/12/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||||||
05/12/2016 | Appellees brief due | | |||||||||||
05/02/2016 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||||||
04/13/2016 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||||||
04/12/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||||||
04/01/2016 | Order withdrawn | | |||||||||||
04/01/2016 | Order entered |
| |||||||||||
03/31/2016 | Letter filed |
| |||||||||||
03/31/2016 | Order entered |
| |||||||||||
03/21/2016 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||||||
03/18/2016 | Record Sent | | |||||||||||
03/15/2016 | Record Sent | | |||||||||||
03/14/2016 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||||||
03/09/2016 | Clerks record due | | |||||||||||
02/24/2016 | Letter filed |
| |||||||||||
02/23/2016 | Notice of late record |
| |||||||||||
02/22/2016 | Clerks record due | | |||||||||||
02/17/2016 | Extension of time to file clerks record disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||||||||
02/17/2016 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed |
| |||||||||||
02/16/2016 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||||||
02/05/2016 | Clerks record due | | |||||||||||
01/22/2016 | Letter filed |
| |||||||||||
01/21/2016 | Notice of late record |
| |||||||||||
01/21/2016 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||||||
01/21/2016 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||||||||||
01/20/2016 | Mediation docketing statement returned |
| |||||||||||
01/16/2016 | Court fee due | | |||||||||||
01/15/2016 | Clerks record due | | |||||||||||
01/15/2016 | Record due | | |||||||||||
01/07/2016 | Notification received that no record was taken | | |||||||||||
01/07/2016 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||||||
01/07/2016 | Letter filed |
| |||||||||||
01/06/2016 | Fee paid |
| |||||||||||
01/06/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||||||
01/06/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||||||
01/06/2016 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||||||
01/05/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||||||
12/22/2015 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | | |||||||||||
05/21/2006 | Appellants brief due | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/02/2017 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/02/2023 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Felipe Gonzalez, Odis F. Newsom, Marcos Hoffman, Peter Ralston, William R. Smith, William M. Wilkins, James L. Babin, Bish Sharma, Camilo Diaz, John N. Stanfield, John R. Dryer, David E. Blockus, Thomas A. Sneed, Robert S. Behringer, Et Al | Appellant | Eugene B. Wilshire, Jr. |
UniversalPegasus International, Inc. | Appellee | Peter A. Stokes Gerard G. Pecht John Byron |
Trial Court Information
55th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 55th District Court
2014-31576
Tammy Adams