Case: 14-13-01023-CR
14-13-01023-CR
11/15/2013
DWI
Santana Mata Olguin
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/17/2014 | Case stored | | |||||||
05/23/2014 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
05/21/2014 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||
03/27/2014 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |||||||
03/27/2014 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||||||
03/12/2014 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||
03/12/2014 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
02/25/2014 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||||
02/24/2014 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
02/24/2014 | Submitted | | |||||||
02/24/2014 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
02/24/2014 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
02/24/2014 | Record due | | |||||||
02/18/2014 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
11/15/2013 | Court reporters information sheet sent |
| |||||||
11/15/2013 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested |
| |||||||
11/15/2013 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
11/14/2013 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
11/14/2013 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
10/25/2013 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/23/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored |
06/17/2039 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Olguin, Santana Mata | Criminal - Appellant | Santana Mata Olguin |
The State Bar of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Jeri Yenne |
Trial Court Information
149th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable Judge, 149th District Court
64937
Stacy Thomas
5 Yrs. TDCJ