Case: 01-20-00636-CR
01-20-00636-CR
09/09/2020
Aggravated Assault
Josafath Torres
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/15/2021 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
03/03/2021 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
02/12/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/12/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
02/12/2021 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
01/13/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/13/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/13/2021 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
12/18/2020 | Record due | | |||||
12/14/2020 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
11/06/2020 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
09/28/2020 | Letter filed |
| |||||
09/18/2020 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court |
| |||||
09/09/2020 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||
09/09/2020 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
08/20/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
08/20/2020 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/03/2021 | Motion | Motion to dismiss |
03/15/2021 | Status | Appellants brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Kim K Ogg Daniel C. McCrory |
Torres, Josafath | Criminal - Appellant | Janet Celeste Blackburn |
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 339th District Court
1586621
Court Reporter 339th District Court
5 yrs tdc