Case Heading (S-07-0299) | |||||
Case Number: | S-07-0299 | Case Docketed On: | 12/31/2007 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | DUSTIN LEE NELSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | DUSTIN LEE NELSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Dustin Lee Nelson | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson Kirk Allan Morgan |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Bruce A. Salzburg Terry L. Armitage D. Michael Pauling Graham Macdonald Smith |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law, Evidence |
Opinion Number: | 2009 WY 37 |
Citation: | 202 P.3d 1072 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
12/31/2007 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
12/31/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
12/31/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
02/19/2008 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
02/19/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received and copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/02/2008 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
04/03/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/21/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
04/28/2008 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, confidential folder. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
04/28/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
05/16/2008 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
05/20/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham M. Smith for appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
05/27/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk A. Morgan for appellant. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
06/19/2008 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
06/19/2008 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
03/11/2009 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order - affirming, Justice Golden writing for the Court. Chief Justice Voigt filed a dissenting opinion. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
03/27/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
03/27/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
03/27/2009 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
04/01/2009 | Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/31/09. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |