Case: 02-24-00033-CV
02-24-00033-CV
01/19/2024
Miscellaneous/other civil
Cassandra Bering
Texas Department of Criminal Justice - PFCMOD
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/13/2024 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||
02/06/2024 | Fee paid |
| |||
02/05/2024 | Notice of late filing fee |
| |||
01/29/2024 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
01/19/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/14/2024 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas Department of Criminal Justice - PFCMOD | Appellee | Alec R. Simpson Briana M. Webb |
Bering, Cassandra | Appellant | David Fielding Nancy Bonilla |
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Susan H. McCoy
153-315910-20
Court Reporter, 153rd District Court