judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Kyle Christian Roebuck v. The State of Texas

Case: 01-23-00317-CR
01-23-00317-CR
04/27/2023
Sexual Assault
Kyle Christian Roebuck
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
02/26/2024Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/26/2024Brief filed - oral argument requested
02/26/2024Appellants brief due
01/29/2024Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedExtension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions
01/29/2024Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/26/2024Appellants brief due
12/27/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/27/2023Appellants brief due
11/27/2023Appellants brief due
11/21/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/21/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/24/2023Case reinstated
10/24/2023Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/2023Motion to reinstate disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/2023Motion to reinstate filed
09/01/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/22/2023Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
08/22/2023Original exhibits filed
08/15/2023Supplemental clerks record filed
08/10/2023Supplemental reporters record due
08/10/2023Supplemental clerks record due
08/04/2023Reporters record filed
08/02/2023Reporters record filed
07/26/2023Response due
07/17/2023Supplemental reporters record filed
07/11/2023Order issuedAbate case
07/06/2023Docketing statement filed
06/26/2023No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record
06/26/2023Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record
06/26/2023Record due
06/22/2023Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record
06/20/2023Clerks record filed
04/27/2023Notice of appeal received
04/27/2023Case began in court of appeals
04/25/2023Notice of appeal filed in trial court
04/25/2023Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/27/2024StatusState brief due
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Kim K Ogg
Jessica A. Caird
Roebuck, Kyle ChristianCriminal - AppellantMatthew Novak
Paul Morgan
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 177th District Court
1626314
Karen Deshetler
5 YRS TDCJ