Case: 03-22-00559-CR
03-22-00559-CR
09/08/2022
Forgery
Qusai Walid Zaqzouq
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/18/2023 | Brief was not filed | State |
| ||||
02/09/2023 | Anders brief filed | Anders |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/25/2023 | Mandate issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
05/04/2023 | Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant |
| |||||||
04/28/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
04/28/2023 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
04/27/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
04/18/2023 | Brief was not filed |
| |||||||
04/18/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
04/17/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
04/10/2023 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||||
04/06/2023 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||||
04/05/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
02/15/2023 | Document Received |
| |||||||
02/09/2023 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||||||
02/09/2023 | Document filed |
| |||||||
02/09/2023 | Anders brief filed |
| |||||||
01/25/2023 | Telephone call received | | |||||||
01/20/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
01/20/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
12/12/2022 | Exhibits filed | | |||||||
12/08/2022 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
12/06/2022 | Email received | | |||||||
12/06/2022 | Email sent | | |||||||
12/02/2022 | Exhibits filed | | |||||||
12/02/2022 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
09/11/2022 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
09/08/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/25/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
07/25/2048 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. Daniel Sakaida The Honorable Stacey M. Soule |
Zaqzouq, Qusai Walid | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. Steven Greene Mr. Qusai Walid Zaqzouq |
Trial Court Information
428th District Court
Hays
Honorable William R. Henry
CR-18-893-D
Ruby A. Castilleja
6 years