Case: PD-0772-23
PD-0772-23
10/27/2023
PDR Case Type
ADELL, DARRELL ANTHONY JR
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/28/2024 | RETURNED TO COA -- 69.4 T.R.A.P |
| |||||
01/31/2024 | PDR DISP | Refused |
| ||||
12/13/2023 | PDR FILED |
| |||||
11/28/2023 | EXT PDR DISP/NFE | Granted |
| ||||
11/28/2023 | EXT PDR FILED |
| |||||
10/30/2023 | EXT PDR DISP/NFE | Granted |
| ||||
10/30/2023 | EXT PDR FILED |
| |||||
10/27/2023 | COA RECORD RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/28/2024 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | |
ADELL, Jr., DARRELL ANTHONY | Appellant | Stanley G. Schneider |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-21-00439-CR
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
149th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable Presiding Judge 149th District Court
87429-CR