Case: 11-24-00011-CR
11-24-00011-CR
01/18/2024
Aggravated Kidnapping
Roger Scott Wilson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/28/2024 | Exhibits filed |
| |||||
02/28/2024 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
02/26/2024 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
02/10/2024 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
02/07/2024 | Document filed |
| |||||
02/06/2024 | Notice of late docketing statement |
| |||||
02/05/2024 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||
01/30/2024 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||
01/26/2024 | Notice of late docketing statement |
| |||||
01/18/2024 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed |
| |||||
01/18/2024 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
01/17/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
01/12/2024 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||
01/12/2024 | Sentence imposed in the trial court |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/29/2024 | Status | Appellants brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Britt Lindsey, Assistant James Hicks, District Attorney |
Wilson, Roger Scott | Criminal - Appellant | Leigh W. Davis |
Trial Court Information
104th District Court
Taylor
Honorable Jeffrey A. Propst, Judge
23171-B
Sherry Powell Hatley, Court Reporter
Life TDCJ