Case: A-2790
A-2790
07/06/1950
MISC PETITION
SOCONY-VACUUM OIL COMPANY
JOHN B. ADERHOLD
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/21/1951 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
04/11/1951 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
03/29/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
03/29/1951 | Errata Filed | | ||
11/24/1950 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
07/14/1950 | Response to Petition | Respondent | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/20/1951 | Concurring Opinion issued. | | ||
06/20/1951 | Opinion issued on motion for rehearing | | ||
04/21/1951 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
04/11/1951 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
04/10/1951 | Miscellaneous letter | | ||
04/04/1951 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
03/29/1951 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
03/29/1951 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | | ||
03/29/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
03/29/1951 | Errata Filed | | ||
03/14/1951 | Opinion issued | | ||
01/11/1951 | Letter Filed | | ||
01/10/1951 | Motion to Correct filed | | ||
11/24/1950 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
11/24/1950 | Motion to re-set submission date filed. | Filing granted | | |
10/30/1950 | Letter Filed | | ||
10/25/1950 | Notice of rehearing, etc. | | ||
10/25/1950 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/25/1950 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/25/1950 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/25/1950 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/25/1950 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/14/1950 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/06/1950 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
John B. Aderhold | Respondent | |
Socony-Vacuum Oil Company | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information