Case: 04-22-00826-CV
04-22-00826-CV
12/08/2022
Real Property
Steven L. Bruington and Nancy Bruington
Chesmar Homes, LLC, Sekisui House and Yantis Corporation
No
8th Court of Appeals
01/20/2023
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/20/2023 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion |
| ||||
12/29/2022 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
12/23/2022 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
12/19/2022 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
12/19/2022 | Amended notice of appeal filed |
| |||||
12/08/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
12/08/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
12/08/2022 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
11/17/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/09/2023 | Motion | Extension of time to file reporter's record |
01/20/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
12/09/2022 | Status | Pending action of court |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Chesmar Homes, LLC | Appellee | S. Mark Murray |
Sekisui House | Appellee | S. Mark Murray |
Yantis Corporation | Appellee | Keith Andrew Robb |
Bruington, Steven L. | Appellant | J. Douglas Sutter |
Bruington, Nancy | Appellant | J. Douglas Sutter |
Trial Court Information
456th District Court
Guadalupe
Honorable Heather H. Wright
22-1755-CV-E
Amy Russell