Case: 07-89-00283-CV
07-89-00283-CV
08/23/1989
Divorce
Bird, Dan Mike and Rebecca Lynn Bird, In the Matter of the
Marriage of, and In the Interest of Rachel Larissa Bird
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/17/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/30/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/12/1990 | Submitted | | |
09/12/1990 | Submission | | |
08/14/1990 | Submission | | |
06/01/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/01/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
04/17/1990 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | | |
04/04/1990 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
03/14/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
02/14/1990 | Do not use | | |
02/07/1990 | Mot ext time file STRANS Disp | | |
01/24/1990 | Mot ext time file STRANS | | |
12/20/1989 | Do not use | | |
12/20/1989 | Do not use | | |
12/19/1989 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | GRANT | |
12/15/1989 | Do not use | | |
12/07/1989 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
11/14/1989 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | GRANT | |
11/02/1989 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
08/23/1989 | Do not use | | |
08/23/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/17/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bird, Dan Mike | Appellee | Richard D. Bird |
Bird, Rebecca Lynn | Appellant | Gene Douglass |
Trial Court Information
46th District Court
Hardeman
Honorable David Cave
8074