Case: 05-07-00889-CV
05-07-00889-CV
07/13/2007
Mandamus
In Re: Patriot Oil & Gas, LLC, Et al.
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/17/2007 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied | |
08/14/2007 | Response to Motion | | |
08/10/2007 | Response to Motion | | |
08/10/2007 | Supplemental Record Filed | | |
08/10/2007 | Response due | | |
07/31/2007 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | |
07/13/2007 | Motion for Relief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/13/2007 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |
07/13/2007 | 75.00 Fee Paid | | |
07/13/2007 | Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2 | | |
07/13/2007 | Motion for Relief Filed | | |
07/13/2007 | Petition for Writ Mandamus | | |
07/13/2007 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/17/2007 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
John Carsrud, Et Al. | Real Party in Interest | Talmage Boston |
Hon. Martin Lowy | Respondent | Dallas Judge |
Patriot Oil & Gas, Llc. Et Al. | Relator | Marcos G. Ronquillo |
Patriot Oil & Gas, Llc Et Al. | Relator | Shawn M. Mccaskill Eric Gordon Walraven |
Trial Court Information
101st Judicial District Court
Dallas
06-02603-E