Case: 09-07-00407-CR
09-07-00407-CR
08/16/2007
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Christopher Thomas Weatherly
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/07/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
06/23/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/20/2011 | Record checked in | | |||||
04/29/2011 | Record checked out | | |||||
12/04/2009 | Exhibits destroyed | | |||||
09/29/2009 | Case stored | | |||||
09/29/2009 | Mandate issued | | |||||
09/25/2009 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||
08/19/2009 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | | ||||
06/17/2009 | Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals | | |||||
06/09/2009 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
06/05/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
05/27/2009 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||
04/22/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/01/2009 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
12/15/2008 | Submitted | | |||||
11/24/2008 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||||
11/24/2008 | Supplemental reporters record filed | | |||||
08/07/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
08/07/2008 | Motion for leave to file original exhibits filed | | |||||
08/07/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
07/18/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/18/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
06/23/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
05/29/2008 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||
05/22/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
05/22/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
05/01/2008 | Supplemental reporters record filed | | |||||
04/29/2008 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
04/08/2008 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
04/07/2008 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
02/26/2008 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
02/22/2008 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
02/11/2008 | Notice of late record | | |||||
01/08/2008 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/07/2008 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
12/06/2007 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
12/06/2007 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
09/04/2007 | Appearance of counsel | | |||||
08/30/2007 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
08/16/2007 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||
08/16/2007 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/29/2009 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Rodney D. Conerly |
Weatherly, Christopher Thomas | Criminal - Appellant | Brian W. Wice |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable John Stevens
93499
15 years