Case: 10-99-00291-CR
10-99-00291-CR
10/07/1999
Possession of Cocaine
James Earl Kennedy
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
10/07/1999
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/18/2000 | Case stored | | |
09/18/2000 | Mandate issued by this Court | | |
05/31/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/17/2000 | Submitted | | |
04/25/2000 | Submission | | |
03/22/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/22/2000 | Brief filed, oral argument not requested | | |
01/26/2000 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/20/2000 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | | |
12/21/1999 | Brief filed, oral argument not requested | | |
11/10/1999 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/05/1999 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | | |
10/27/1999 | Clerk's Record filed | | |
10/22/1999 | Reporter's Record filed | | |
10/07/1999 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
10/07/1999 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
10/05/1999 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/17/1999 | Request for docketing statement | | |
09/16/1999 | No Description Available. | | |
09/16/1999 | No Description Available. | | |
09/16/1999 | No Description Available. | | |
09/14/1999 | Judgment or Sentence | | |
09/14/1999 | No Description Available. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/18/2025 | Case Stored | Destroy case in 25 years. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas, The State Of | Criminal - State of Texas | Amy Sparks Williams Kerry P. Fitzgerald Bill Hill |
Kennedy, James Earl | Appellant | Deborah E. Farris |
Trial Court Information
265th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Keith T. Dean
F99-46469-R
17 yrs