Case: 08-01-00470-CV
08-01-00470-CV
11/16/2001
Divorce
Ybanez, Marianne
Ybanez, Richard
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/28/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/07/2002 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
03/07/2002 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
03/07/2002 | Submission | | |
03/07/2002 | Submitted | | |
01/25/2002 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
12/20/2001 | Affidavit from Reporter Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
12/17/2001 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
12/12/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
12/12/2001 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
12/12/2001 | supp. record filed (sup clerk/reporters record) | | |
12/07/2001 | Affidavit from Reporter Filed | | |
11/16/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
11/16/2001 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
11/16/2001 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/28/2002 | Case Stored | Court has determined no historical value - file to be destroyed once retention schedule has been met |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
YBANEZ, RICHARD | Appellee | Hon. G. Daniel Mena |
DISTRICT CLERK, EL PASO COUNTY | Trial court clerk | Gilbert Sanchez |
YBANEZ, MARIANNE | Appellant | Hon. Albert A. Biel, Jr. |
JUDGE, 388TH DISTRICT COURT | Trial Court Judge | The Honorable Patricia A. Macias |
COURT REPORTER, 388TH DIST.CT. | Court reporter | Patricia Madrid |
Trial Court Information
388th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Patricia Ann Macias
99CM7370