Register of Actions
Case No. 23-12-18144
State of Texas Vs. Oberman, Aaron Brice | § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Oberman, Aaron Brice | Male White DOB: 11/26/1980 | William Britton Hall Retained 936-539-5800(W) | |
135 Shadowood St. Conroe, TX 77304 SID: TX06203080 Other Agency Numbers 984279 Unknown | ||||
State | State of Texas | Other | ||
207 W. Phillips 2nd Floor Conroe, TX 77301 |
Charges: Oberman, Aaron Brice | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | TAMPER/FABRICATE PHYS EVID W/INTENT TO IMPAIR | 37.09(c) | Third Degree Felony | 12/05/2023 | |
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/06/2023 | Surety Bond | ||||
12/06/2023 | Signed Order | ||||
12/07/2023 | Information (OCA) | ||||
12/11/2023 | Ancillary Conditions of Bond | ||||
12/12/2023 | Letters | ||||
12/20/2023 | Letters | ||||
03/05/2024 | Information (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hamilton, Kathleen)
|
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
23-12-18144 | Oberman, Aaron Brice 11/26/1980 | 12/07/2023 359th Judicial District Court | Adult Felony - Filed by Information Pending |
|