Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/17/2002 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Rose. Gaming Control Board. | | |
09/17/2002 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Young. Gaming Control Board. | | |
09/17/2002 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Nersesian & Sankiewicz--check no. 2590. | | |
09/17/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 02-16176 |
09/25/2002 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas F. Kummer. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | | |
10/04/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 02-17214 |
10/04/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Thomas F. Kummer. (Docketing statement) | | |
12/02/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 02-20600 |
12/12/2002 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | | 02-21255 |
12/23/2002 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: February 12, 2002 and July 16, 2002. Court Reporter: Julie M. Lever. (Submitted by law firm of Nersesian & Sankiewicz.) | | 02-21931 |
12/23/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of Transcript of 2/12/02 and July 16, 2002. (Submitted by Nersesian & Sankiewicz.) | | 02-21932 |
03/06/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On December 23, 2002, court reporter Julie M. Lever filed a certified copy of the transcript for proceedings conducted on February 12, 2002. Because we are unable to determine whether all transcripts necessary for the review of this appeal have been filed with this court, appellants shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no further transcripts are required. | | 03-03839 |
03/14/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 03-04335 |
04/14/2003 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 03-06284 |
04/14/2003 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | | 03-06285 |
05/05/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: June 13, 2003. | | 03-07557 |
06/16/2003 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 03-09936 |
07/16/2003 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 03-12028 |
09/17/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on November 13, 2003, at 9:00 a.m. (En Banc) | | |
10/21/2003 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger. | | |
10/29/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | |
11/05/2003 | Order/Incoming | Filed Executive Order. District Judge Andrew J. Puccinelli is appointed to sit in the place of Justice Myron E. Leavitt. | | 03-18398 |
11/05/2003 | Order/Incoming | Filed Executive Order. District Judge Archie E. Blake is appointed to sit in the place of Justice A. William Maupin. | | 03-18400 |
11/13/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. EN BANC | | |
11/15/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. fn1[The Honorable Robert E. Rose, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter. The Honorable Andrew J. Puccinelli, Judge of the Fourth Judicial District Court, was designated by the Governor to sit in place of the Honorable Myron E. Leavitt, Justice. Nev. Const. art. 6, sec. 4. The Honorable Archie E. Blake, Judge of the Third Judicial District Court, was designated by the Governor to sit in place of the Honorable A. William Maupin, Justice. Nev. Const. art. 5, sec. 4.] "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC-Shearing, C.J., Agosti, Becker, Gibbons and Douglas, JJ., Puccinelli, D.J. and Blake, D.J. | | 04-20866 |
12/06/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Nersesian & Sankewicz--check no. 4036. | | |
12/06/2004 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | | 04-22171 |
02/11/2005 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). EN BANC-Becker, C.J., Gibbons and Douglas, JJ; Puccinelli, D.J. and Blake, D.J. | | 05-02767 |
03/08/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 05-03261 |
03/08/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
03/21/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 10, 2005. | | 05-03261 |