Case: 01-91-00824-CR
01-91-00824-CR
09/13/1991
Assault & battery
Breshears, Jason Matthew
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/25/1993 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
05/25/1993 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
05/10/1993 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
04/14/1993 | Petition for discretionary review disposed | Refused | |
02/25/1993 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
02/24/1993 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
02/05/1993 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
02/01/1993 | Extension of time to file PDR filed in Court of Criminal Appeals. | | |
01/29/1993 | Extension to file writ disposed | Grant motion | |
01/19/1993 | Extension of time to file PDR filed in Court of Criminal Appeals. | | |
01/14/1993 | Extension to file writ disposed | Grant motion | |
12/30/1992 | Extension of time to file PDR disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals. | Grant motion | |
12/28/1992 | Extension of time to file PDR filed in Court of Criminal Appeals. | | |
11/12/1992 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/12/1992 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/04/1992 | Submitted | | |
11/04/1992 | Submission | | |
11/04/1992 | Submitted | | |
10/07/1992 | Submission | | |
07/02/1992 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
07/02/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/02/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
07/02/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/16/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
05/18/1992 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
05/07/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
04/13/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
04/02/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
03/24/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
03/17/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
02/27/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
02/18/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
01/16/1992 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
01/16/1992 | Statement of facts filed | | |
12/27/1991 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
12/04/1991 | Brief due for retained counsel | | |
10/29/1991 | Transcript filed | | |
09/13/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/12/1991 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
08/30/1991 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/25/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - Appellant | James M. Sims |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes |
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
581,760
30 yrs tdc