Case Information: 38245 | |||
Short Caption: | HUMMEL VS. GOPHER CONSTRUCTION | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 37421 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9801565 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 08/06/2001 / Jenkins, Nathan | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/27/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from James Andre Boles--check no. 3756. | ||
07/27/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-12742 | |
08/03/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Docket entries prior to 12/13/99. Due Date: 10 days | ||
08/06/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathan M. Jenkins. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
08/27/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 01-14472 | |
09/05/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 01-14975 | |
09/24/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." SNP/CLK | 01-16025 | |
09/24/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |