Case Information: 33590 | |||
Short Caption: | CLARK CO SCHOOL DISTRICT VS. HOLT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A390319 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/22/1999 / Turner, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/11/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/11/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-00141 | |
01/21/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-00422 | |
01/21/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certification No Transcript is to be Requested. | 99-00423 | |
01/22/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/19/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Appellant's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 3/18/99). | 99-02002 | |
03/26/1999 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Points and Authorities in Opposition to Stay Pending Appeal. | 99-02204 | |
03/30/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Request for Permission to File Reply Brief. | 99-02333 | |
04/16/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due: 14 days from the date of this order. | 99-02963 | |
04/29/1999 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order Filed April 16, 1999 | 99-03411 | |
05/11/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant filed a motion for a stay pending appeal. In response to this court's show cause order filed April 16, 1999, appellant concedes the motion is moot. We hereby dismiss the motion for a stay. fn1[We deny appellant's motion for permission to file a reply to respondent's opposition to the motion for a stay]. | 99-03808 | |
05/17/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 99-04002 | |
05/17/1999 | Settlement Agreement | Filed Settlement Agreement. | 99-04003 | |
06/02/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 99-04581 | |
06/02/1999 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |