Case Information: 11-DA-0027 | |||
Short Caption: | AEON FINANCIAL, LLC V. MARY B. HAYNES, ET AL | Classification: | Discretionary - Discretionary - Interlocutory |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAL001920-09 | Filed Date: | 09/06/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/06/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Petitioner | Aeon Financial, LLC | N |
| |||||||||
Respondent | Mary B. Haynes | N | Pro Se | N | ||||||||
Respondent | District of Columbia | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
09/06/2011 | Filed | Application For Interlocutory Appeal (Petitioner)(Was in SUperior Court on 9/2/11). | ||
09/06/2011 | Filed | Filing Fee Paid of $100.00. | ||
09/07/2011 | Filed | TMC/APPLCIATION FOR ALLOWANCE TO APPEAL//MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE LODGED OPPO | ||
01/09/2012 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Respondent District of Columbia) | Granted | |
01/18/2012 | Filed | Opposition - to appellee's motion for leave to file opposition to appellant's application for permission to appeal (Petitioner) | ||
01/27/2012 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Leave and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE LODGED OPPOSITION and... | ||
01/27/2012 | Filed | Opposition to applicant's application for permission to appeal (Respondent District of Columbia) | ||
01/27/2012 | Filed | Order Denying Application For Allowance Of Appeal |