Case Information: 81-CV-0763 | |||
Short Caption: | BOYNTON, STEPHEN S. LOPEZ, J. AUDREY HAVICE | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA11417-78 | Filed Date: | 06/11/1981 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/11/1981 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 01/13/1983 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 08/29/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/29/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | BOYNTON, STEPHEN S. LOPEZ, J. AUDREY HAVICE | |||
06/11/1981 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
01/13/1983 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
08/29/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
11/29/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/01/1984 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |